Financial history CALLINGTON AMATEUR DRAMA SOCIETY

Charity number: 1054831
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022
Total gross income £6.10k £7.26k £3.54k £6.63k £6.14k
Total expenditure £7.09k £6.08k £6.18k £4.35k £8.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A