Financial history DUDLEY AND DISTRICT HOSPITAL BROADCASTING

Charity number: 1055132
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £0 £18.25k £2.00k £500 £8.75k
Total expenditure £417 £45 £17.93k £200 £12.05k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A