BELSWAINS SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1055185
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 01 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 09 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 09 January 2020 193 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 10 August 2018 41 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 13 July 2017 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required