Financial history ACE OF CLUBS (CLAPHAM)

Charity number: 1055187
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021
Total gross income £264.40k £237.80k £264.83k £430.57k £351.95k
Total expenditure £281.57k £260.66k £271.49k £328.62k £346.00k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A