Financial history EAST LONDON CABBIES OUTING FOR SPECIAL NEEDS CHILDREN

Charity number: 1055257
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021
Total gross income £2.10k £3.84k £3.84k £3.72k £200
Total expenditure £1.32k £3.13k £1.88k £87 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A