Accounts and annual returns ALLFARTHING SCHOOL P.T.A

Charity number: 1055327
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 22 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 22 March 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 21 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 21 November 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 05 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 05 March 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2018 18 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 18 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2017 16 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 16 November 2017 On time Download Open in new window