Financial history ALLFARTHING SCHOOL P.T.A

Charity number: 1055327
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £64.44k £88.03k £44.81k £25.98k £32.91k
Total expenditure £48.60k £68.17k £71.13k £26.81k £21.29k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £2.88k