TONBRIDGE ROUND TABLE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1055600
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 28 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 22 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 11 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 26 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required