TONBRIDGE ROUND TABLE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1055600
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £7.94k £8.18k £10.72k £23.23k £27.00k
Total expenditure £3.21k £3.24k £11.30k £13.43k £14.88k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A