Accounts and annual returns HINTON TRUST

Charity number: 1055631
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 04 February 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 02 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 02 February 2021 363 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2018 08 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2017 19 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 Not Required