Financial history HINTON TRUST

Charity number: 1055631
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £12.59k £7 £24 £5.40k £1.29k
Total expenditure £7.09k £3.06k £5.00k £3.41k £1.89k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A