Financial history 1ST CAMBORNE (ROSKEAR) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1055740
Charity reporting is up to date (53 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £22.44k £10.63k £5.53k £9.71k £10.95k
Total expenditure £22.44k £10.66k £6.09k £3.57k £3.33k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £10.00k