Financial history ST PAULS COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 1055769
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £39.06k £40.55k £53.34k £43.22k £35.23k
Total expenditure £39.23k £40.66k £62.50k £43.00k £49.09k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A