Accounts and annual returns The Beacons Recreational Centre

Charity number: 1055975
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2023 Overdue Overdue by 2 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 Overdue Overdue by 2 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 14 June 2023 134 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 14 June 2023 499 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 14 June 2023 864 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 14 June 2023 1230 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required