Accounts and annual returns INTO AFRICA TRUST

Charity number: 1056289
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 Overdue Overdue by 89 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Overdue Overdue by 89 days
Annual return 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 454 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 454 days
Annual return 31 August 2019 Overdue Overdue by 819 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Overdue Overdue by 819 days
Annual return 31 August 2018 26 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 15 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required