Governing document CAP UK
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22/11/1995 AS AMENDED ON 17/06/1996 AS AMENDED ON 10/10/2001 AS AMENDED ON 01/04/2009 AS AMENDED ON 21/05/2014
Charitable objects
1. TO PROTECT CHILDREN FROM BULLYING AND VERBAL, PHYSICAL AND SEXUAL ABUSE AND NEGLECT BY ADVANCING THEIR EDUCATION TOWARDS THE RECOGNITION AND PREVENTION OF SUCH ASSAULTS; 2. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF ADULTS RESPONSIBLE FOR THE CARE, EDUCATION, WELFARE OR PROTECTION OF CHILDREN IN ALL ASPECTS OF CHILD PROTECTION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.