ROCK COMMUNITY PROJECT

Charity number: 1056688
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rita May Rich Trustee 16 September 2019 None on record
JEAN MARY LAMOON Trustee 16 October 2012 None on record
PATRICIA DOREEN COMPTON Chair None on record
JEAN MOIRA GRESTY Trustee None on record
MRS ANN HAWKER Trustee None on record
George Worth Trustee 28 September 2016 None on record
Sheila Hunt Trustee 20 September 2014 None on record
Martin Horton Trustee 20 September 2014 None on record
Dr Andy Murray Trustee 30 September 2015 None on record