Trustees THE MILTON KEYNES CHINESE CHRISTIAN CHURCH
Charity Number: 1056899

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tao Wang | Chair | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Yvonne LK Chan | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Yin Yee Chris Ho | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Haifeng Xie | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Yi Han | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Wing-Yee Cecilia Teh | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Carol Huang | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Pang | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ronald Keng Hung Chan | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Oi-Yee Lau | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Tsui Ling Ng | Trustee | 14 October 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.