Accounts and annual returns KING ALFRED'S SCHOOL FUND

Charity number: 1057062
Charity reporting is overdue by 72 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2023 Overdue Overdue by 72 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Overdue Overdue by 72 days
Annual return 05 April 2022 01 February 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 19 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 03 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 06 February 2020 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required