UNIVERSITY HOSPITALS DORSET NHS CHARITY

Charity number: 1057366
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 22 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 22 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 28 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 28 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 30 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 30 November 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 19 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 19 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 20 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 20 January 2017 On time Download