ST TEATH COMMUNITY BUS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1057825
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £7.11k £5.18k £5.85k £5.53k £7.21k
Total expenditure £3.55k £4.64k £1.31k £5.15k £5.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A