Trustees BRITISH MEDICAL ACUPUNCTURE SOCIETY

Charity number: 1057942
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Charlotte Gavins Trustee 11 June 2022
None on record
Neil Rooney Trustee 11 June 2022
None on record
Dr Sarah Bright Trustee 11 June 2022
None on record
Dr Evren Kul Panza Trustee 24 June 2020
None on record
Dr Affifah Farrukh Trustee 24 June 2020
None on record
Dr Jennifer Dawn Ireland Trustee 24 June 2020
None on record
Dr Victoria Mary Hardwick Trustee 05 June 2019
None on record
Dr Elaine Ying Kwan Cheung Trustee 05 June 2019
None on record
Dr Federico Campos Trustee 05 June 2019
None on record
Donnchadh Lawler Trustee 13 April 2017
None on record
Dr Amer Ikram Sheikh Trustee 01 June 2016
None on record
Catherine Abisheganaden-Tiphanie Trustee 01 June 2013
None on record