BITTAFORD COMMUNITY HALL

Charity number: 1057947
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 20 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 05 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 12 March 2020 41 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 10 March 2020 404 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 10 March 2020 769 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required