Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF SAINT THERESA'S

Charity number: 1058253
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2021 22 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 22 January 2022 176 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 22 January 2022 541 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 22 January 2022 907 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1437 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1437 days