ANIMAL SAMARITANS MIDLANDS TRUST

Charity number: 1058312
Charity reporting is overdue by 76 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
05/04/2015 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019
Total gross income £135.17k £126.18k £116.30k £114.53k £151.00k
Total expenditure £135.91k £126.59k £121.15k £110.10k £120.59k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A