WEST MIDLANDS AMBULANCE SERVICE NHS TRUST GENERAL CHARITY

Charity number: 1058359
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 18 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 18 October 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 25 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 25 November 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 26 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 26 November 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 22 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 22 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 24 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required