REFUGEE WOMEN'S ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1058459
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £309.55k £165.70k £165.61k £217.01k £103.95k
Total expenditure £254.25k £159.20k £164.52k £175.63k £171.25k
Income from government contracts £57.02k £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £5.67k £13.61k £13.61k £20.79k