Accounts and annual returns BACK TO GOD EVANGELICAL CHRISTIAN MINISTRY

Charity number: 1058513
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 10 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 10 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 23 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 08 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 18 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required