Accounts and annual returns ASHA TRUST (UK)

Charity number: 1058568
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 26 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 22 March 2022 142 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 02 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 04 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 11 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required