WEST LONDON YMCA

Charity number: 1058593
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Christopher Stern Trustee 19 September 2020
YMCA St Paul's Group Received: On time
Adreonke Savage Trustee 16 March 2019 None on record
Andy Palmer Chair 26 April 2018
FOREST YOUNG MEN'S CHRISTIAN ASSOCIATION OF EAST LONDON Received: On time
Gerald Chifamba Trustee 18 May 2018
YMCA St Paul's Group Received: On time
Kenneth John Youngman Trustee 26 April 2018 None on record
Edward Weiss FCA Trustee 26 April 2018
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF BEACONSFIELD Received: On time
YMCA St Paul's Group Received: On time
DIOCESAN TRUSTEES (OXFORD) LTD Received: On time
SAINT MARY AND ALL SAINTS BEACONSFIELD DEVELOPMENT FUND Received: On time
Duncan Ingram Trustee 15 March 2019
YMCA St Paul's Group Received: On time
THE CHILDREN'S TRUST Received: On time
Louise Hedges Trustee 26 April 2018
FRIENDS OF TOLWORTH SCHOOL (F.O.T.S) Overdue by 83 days
FOREST YOUNG MEN'S CHRISTIAN ASSOCIATION OF EAST LONDON Received: On time
HELEN POSNER Trustee 29 September 2016 None on record