BARNET ELDERLY ASIANS GROUP

Charity number: 1058647
Charity reporting is up to date (198 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £27.74k £22.84k £18.26k £15.00k £15.00k
Total expenditure £17.48k £13.14k £11.85k £12.18k £12.18k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A £4.80k £2.04k
Income from government grants £2.00k £7.35k £7.35k £4.80k £2.04k