2ND LONGTON (ST ANDREWS) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1058860
Charity reporting is up to date (11 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £21.68k £24.16k £22.24k £19.93k £16.27k
Total expenditure £19.51k £20.50k £19.65k £18.18k £18.99k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A