Financial history FATHER CROOKS CHARITY

Charity number: 1059013
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £18.59k £23.17k £22.39k £24.66k £17.19k
Total expenditure £39.56k £40.50k £41.41k £56.75k £37.22k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A