Accounts and annual returns THE A.M. PERRY CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1059073
Charity reporting is up to date (1 day late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 July 2024 02 May 2025 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 July 2024 02 May 2025 1 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 July 2023 13 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 July 2023 Not Required
Annual return 01 July 2022 17 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 01 July 2021 04 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 01 July 2020 24 May 2021 23 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 July 2020 Not Required