Financial history THE FRIENDS OF ST THOMAS' CHURCH WEST HYDE

Charity number: 1059344
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £44 £27 £55 £70 £14
Total expenditure £25 £55 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A