Financial history FRIENDS OF ST ALDHELM'S SCHOOL

Charity number: 1059507
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £4.59k £7.43k £7.64k £2.06k £1.93k
Total expenditure £5.03k £12.86k £5.16k £4.75k £3.78k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A