Accounts and annual returns ELMTREE SCHOOL FUND

Charity number: 1059524
Charity reporting is overdue by 40 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 Overdue Overdue by 40 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Overdue Overdue by 40 days
Annual return 31 August 2020 23 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 27 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 29 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 20 May 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2017 01 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

01 February 2018 On time Download Open in new window