Trustees PLANTLIFE INTERNATIONAL-THE WILD PLANT CONSERVATION CHARITY

Charity number: 1059559
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PROF DAVID HILL Chair 01 October 2015
None on record
Dr Jill Kowal Trustee 15 December 2021
FRIENDS OF JERUSALEM BOTANICAL GARDENS
Received: On time
Patrick Esmond James Trustee 15 December 2021
THE HACKFALL TRUST
Received: On time
Anthony John Payne Trustee 15 December 2021
SANDY VILLAGE HALL
Received: 32 days late
Timothy William Jones Trustee 15 July 2021
CANLLAW (ERYRI) CYF
Received: On time
James Jansen Trustee 15 July 2021
None on record
Sally Louise Thomas Trustee 15 July 2021
None on record
Hien Vi Luong Trustee 15 July 2021
None on record
ANN ROWSWELL Trustee 01 March 2018
None on record
DR ROSETTA MARGARET PLUMMER Trustee 30 June 2017
None on record
Clive Aslet Trustee 01 October 2015
INTERNATIONAL NETWORK FOR TRADITIONAL BUILDING ARCHITECTURE & URBANISM (UK)
Received: On time
Dr Tim Stowe Trustee 27 March 2014
INTERNATIONAL ECO FUND
Received: On time