LANGHAM ARTS TRUST

Charity number: 1059611
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 30/12/2017 30/12/2018 30/12/2019 30/12/2020
Total gross income £330.30k £508.65k £428.51k £557.68k £343.14k
Total expenditure £326.17k £497.45k £439.47k £528.93k £340.98k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £349.19k N/A £401.65k N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 N/A £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A £159.46k N/A £0 N/A
Income - Endowments N/A £0 N/A £0 N/A
Income - Investment N/A £0 N/A £0 N/A
Income - Other N/A £0 N/A £156.04k N/A
Income - Legacies N/A £0 N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £497.45k N/A £525.08k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 N/A £3.85k N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A £0 N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 N/A £0 N/A