Trustees BRACKEN TRUST LIMITED
Charity number: 1059668
Charity reporting is overdue by 79 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lisa Griffiths | Chair | 14 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Bruce | Trustee | 06 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Linda Caroline Howells | Trustee | 06 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Howard Grant Russon | Trustee | 20 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Maurice Leslie Thorn | Trustee | 11 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Barry Hicks | Trustee | 07 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
DR Stephanie Warrick | Trustee | 22 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
MAI ELLIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
REGINALD CAWTHORNE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DR SIM OVIS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.