AMBER COMMUNITIES TRUST

Charity number: 1059704
Charity reporting is overdue by 593 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 Overdue Overdue by 227 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Overdue Overdue by 227 days
Annual return 05 April 2019 Overdue Overdue by 593 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Overdue Overdue by 593 days
Annual return 05 April 2018 11 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2017 12 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2016 11 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 Not Required