THE GLENDALE GATEWAY TRUST

Charity number: 1059761
Charity reporting is up to date (5 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £262.95k £282.94k £300.21k £254.71k £499.05k
Total expenditure £313.41k £305.16k £325.27k £311.70k £266.20k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £8.00k £10.15k £1.13k £6.48k £200.19k