THE ORLANDO CHAMBER CHOIR

Charity number: 1059881
Charity reporting is up to date (9 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 09 June 2021 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 16 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2018 03 June 2019 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2017 05 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2016 24 April 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 Not Required