Financial history BATH AND NORTH EAST SOMERSET CARERS CENTRE

Charity number: 1060080
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £930.78k £874.41k £894.17k £863.98k £866.07k
Total expenditure £789.00k £883.98k £825.76k £755.18k £670.21k
Income from government contracts £504.67k £507.12k £508.14k £508.68k £509.35k
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £167.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £70.14k £55.23k £45.77k £63.93k £50.20k
Income - Other trading activities £14.62k £14.95k £24.62k £15.51k £0
Income - Charitable activities £842.66k £801.81k £821.44k £781.92k £804.82k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £3.36k £2.42k £2.35k £2.61k £2.23k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £8.82k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £786.22k £880.66k £808.48k £729.80k £655.09k
Expenditure - Raising funds £2.78k £3.32k £17.29k £25.38k £15.12k
Expenditure - Governance £25.39k £0 £4.89k £0 £3.56k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0