ST KEW COMMUNITY PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHERS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1060224
Charity reporting is overdue by 450 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2014 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018
Total gross income £7.14k £20.64k £7.95k £6.72k £7.37k
Total expenditure £8.79k £18.34k £8.41k £5.20k £5.37k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £365 N/A N/A N/A