Accounts and annual returns BOURNEMOUTH GUIDE CAMP ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1060476
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 29 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 29 September 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 30 September 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 30 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 30 May 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 30 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 21 May 2018 On time
Annual return 31 December 2016 18 April 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 06 April 2017 On time Download Open in new window