Financial history GATSBY TECHNICAL EDUCATION PROJECTS

Charity number: 1060744
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £1.53m £1.63m £1.50m £1.71m £1.64m
Total expenditure £1.58m £1.63m £1.51m £1.73m £1.64m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £50.00k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.53m £0 £1.50m £1.71m £0
Income - Other trading activities £453 £0 £555 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £1.63m £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £295 £332 £82
Income - Other £297 £0 £0 £0 £1.64m
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.58m £1.63m £1.51m £1.73m £1.64m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £3.83k £13.38k £0 £6.28k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0