THE ROMANIAN AID FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1060828
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £38.24k £37.19k £22.54k £115.42k £26.20k
Total expenditure £34.66k £62.95k £20.86k £51.72k £37.75k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A