Trustees ST. JOHN'S SCHOOL AND COLLEGE

Charity number: 1061001
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Nadia Cowdrey Trustee 16 June 2021
ROCKINGHORSE CHILDREN'S CHARITY
Received: On time
Karen Nicholls Trustee 27 August 2020
None on record
Peter Redwood Trustee 02 January 2020
None on record
Simon Smith Trustee 13 December 2018
None on record
Mary Fawcett Trustee 13 December 2018
None on record
LINDA MARY MCMILLAN BED HONS Trustee 06 July 2017
None on record
Anna Thatcher Trustee 18 March 2016
None on record
WILLIAM CHARLES CATCHPOLE Trustee 11 July 2011
THE OUTLOOK FOUNDATION
Received: On time