Governing document City of Norwich Brass
Charity number: 1061066
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18TH FEBRUARY 1997. AS AMENDED 27TH NOVEMBER 1997 AND 13 JANUARY 2009 AS AMENDED 14 JANUARY 2009. as amended on 04 Oct 2022
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE IMPROVE DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN THE APPRECIATION OF THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC BY THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND RECITALS.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.